|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1925 | 03/03/1925 | 49 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3487 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1927 | 16/04/1927 | 83 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1929 | 11/05/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1931 | 09/05/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7511 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1933 | 04/02/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1934 | 29/09/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7692 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1936 | 26/09/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1938 | 03/09/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1940 | 12/10/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1944 | 28/10/1944 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9444 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1949 | 07/06/1949 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9397 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63932 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1951 | 19/12/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1958 | 02/05/1958 | 39 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1960 | 30/09/1960 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1962 | 23/03/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/11/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 487 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1574 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
14/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1925. Dep: 03/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3487 |
||
24/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. | ||
23/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929. | ||
04/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7511 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. | ||
21/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933. | ||
01/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7692 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936. | ||
13/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938. | ||
07/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8186 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9444 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
11/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3932 | ||
04/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. | ||
10/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1949. Dep: 07/06/1949. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 9397 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63932 |
||
24/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1951. Dep: 19/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21044 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1960. Dep: 30/09/1960. | ||
16/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1962. Dep: 23/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63932 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |