|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1926 | 15/10/1926 | 184 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1928 | 28/12/1928 | 72 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1930 | 31/12/1930 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1933 | 22/07/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1935 | 15/06/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1938 | 15/01/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1940 | 02/03/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1941 | 08/03/1941 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1942 | 13/06/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1946 | 06/02/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1948 | 07/05/1948 | 26 days | Heavy | Boiler number 9463 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63940 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1948 | 25/08/1948 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1949 | 23/09/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1952 | 12/06/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 21051 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1954 | 01/09/1954 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1956 | 10/11/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1958 | 03/02/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1960 | 25/10/1960 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1962 | 30/08/1962 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 495 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1582 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
07/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3495 | ||
15/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1926. Dep: 15/10/1926. | ||
18/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1928. Dep: 28/12/1928. | ||
22/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930. | ||
17/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7691 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 15/06/1935. | ||
17/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2) |
||
08/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 15/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9162 (Diagram 2) |
||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941. | ||
16/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942. | ||
10/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
01/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3940 | ||
24/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1946. Dep: 06/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9471 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9463 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63940 |
||
10/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 25/08/1948. | ||
15/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 23/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9015 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 12/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21051 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1954. Dep: 01/09/1954. | ||
10/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21069 (Diagram 2) |
||
30/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1958. Dep: 03/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21039 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1960. Dep: 25/10/1960. | ||
10/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1962. Dep: 30/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63940 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |