|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1933 | 09/09/1933 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1934 | 04/08/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1936 | 25/07/1936 | 84 days | General | Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 8462 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1947 | 15/10/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9164 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1948 | 05/01/1949 | 26 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63948 |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1950 | 04/02/1950 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 9317 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1952 | 30/04/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21049 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1953 | 30/07/1953 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1953 | 24/09/1953 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 21051 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1959 | 28/08/1959 | 31 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28962 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/05/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2955 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1774 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
19/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1933. Dep: 09/09/1933. | ||
23/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934. | ||
03/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8972 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8462 (Diagram 2) |
||
15/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. | ||
18/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. | ||
24/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8974 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
21/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3948 | ||
31/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9164 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 05/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63948 |
||
01/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9317 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
09/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
30/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1952. Dep: 30/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21049 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1953. Dep: 30/07/1953. | ||
11/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1953. Dep: 24/09/1953. | ||
03/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/06/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. | ||
03/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21035 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21051 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28962 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63948 from Grantham (34F) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |