|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 16/06/1933 | 27/07/1933 | 42 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1934 | 27/08/1934 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1937 | 20/08/1937 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1940 | 07/09/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1944 | 15/07/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9438 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1947 | 21/05/1947 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1949 | 02/07/1949 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1951 | 05/07/1951 | 38 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28819 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/06/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2957 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1776 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/06/1933. Dep: 27/07/1933. | ||
11/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1934. Dep: 27/08/1934. | ||
23/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8858 (Diagram 2) |
||
24/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 20/08/1937. | ||
11/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940. | ||
29/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. | ||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9438 (Diagram 2) |
||
04/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3950 | ||
28/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1947. Dep: 21/05/1947. | ||
05/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949. | ||
21/07/1949 | Modification | Diagram 2 number 9760 boiler fitted | ||
23/07/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63950 | ||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
29/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1951. Dep: 05/07/1951. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
12/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28356 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. | ||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. | ||
09/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28819 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63950 from Grantham (34F) | ||
12/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |