|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1935 | 24/08/1935 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1937 | 03/04/1937 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1938 | 17/08/1938 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1939 | 23/12/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8183 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1941 | 23/08/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1943 | 11/09/1943 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9468 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1947 | 17/10/1947 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1949 | 16/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63956 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1950 | 06/10/1950 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1951 | 05/03/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1951 | 08/01/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1954 | 09/07/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1957 | 02/02/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21041 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1957 | 12/06/1957 | 60 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1960 | 02/06/1960 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1961 | 30/12/1961 | 41 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1950 | Unreported renumberings | The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! | SLS/195007 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/12/1933 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2431 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1782 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
23/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935. | ||
08/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937. | ||
17/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1938. Dep: 17/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8456 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8183 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. | ||
03/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. | ||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943. | ||
26/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9468 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. | ||
17/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3956 | ||
04/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1947. Dep: 17/10/1947. | ||
14/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1949. Dep: 16/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63956 |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1950. Dep: 06/10/1950. | ||
17/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1951. Dep: 05/03/1951. | ||
09/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1951. Dep: 08/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21045 (Diagram 2) |
||
04/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1954. Dep: 09/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21004 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1957. Dep: 02/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21041 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1957. Dep: 12/06/1957. | ||
01/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960. | ||
27/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
20/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1961. Dep: 30/12/1961. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63956 from Grantham (34F) | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |