|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1935 | 18/09/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1937 | 13/07/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1938 | 03/06/1938 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1940 | 17/02/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1941 | 18/10/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1943 | 28/08/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8462 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1947 | 15/09/1947 | 99 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1949 | 31/01/1949 | 20 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63959 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1949 | 21/04/1949 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1950 | 26/04/1950 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1952 | 16/01/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1954 | 10/12/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/01/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2434 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1785 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
14/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1935. Dep: 18/09/1935. | ||
01/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1937. Dep: 13/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8460 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1938. Dep: 03/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8976 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940. | ||
20/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. | ||
31/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8462 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. | ||
16/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3959 | ||
09/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1947. Dep: 15/09/1947. | ||
12/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1949. Dep: 31/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63959 |
||
14/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1949. Dep: 21/04/1949. | ||
23/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1950. Dep: 26/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4405 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1952. Dep: 16/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21000 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1954. Dep: 10/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21055 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
19/10/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63959 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
12/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |