|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1945 | 05/05/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9386 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1949 | 18/02/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 9161 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63977 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1951 | 09/07/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21028 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1954 | 22/10/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 21049 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1958 | 11/06/1958 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1958 | 23/08/1958 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1960 | 18/11/1960 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/11/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3847 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1945 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945. | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3977 | ||
13/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9386 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1949. Dep: 18/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9161 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63977 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
07/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1951. Dep: 09/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21028 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 22/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21049 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1958. Dep: 11/06/1958. | ||
11/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958. | ||
26/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1960. Dep: 18/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21053 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63977 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |