|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1944 | 04/11/1944 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1947 | 24/03/1947 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1948 | 12/05/1948 | 24 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63981 |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1948 | 14/01/1949 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 9391 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1951 | 31/05/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21025 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1954 | 02/04/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1957 | 30/10/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1961 | 10/03/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1961 | 09/12/1961 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3851 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1949 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
04/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. | ||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. | ||
18/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3981 | ||
06/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1947. Dep: 24/03/1947. | ||
19/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1948. Dep: 12/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63981 |
||
29/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1948. Dep: 14/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9391 (Diagram 2) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
02/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1951. Dep: 31/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21025 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21034 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21057 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1961. Dep: 10/03/1961. | ||
19/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
03/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63981 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |