|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1921 | 20/08/1921 | 109 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1923 | 15/10/1923 | 24 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 463N |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1926 | 18/03/1926 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 7514 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3463 |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1928 | 23/05/1928 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 7524 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1930 | 22/05/1930 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 198 days | General | Boiler number 7239 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1934 | 02/06/1934 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1935 | 04/10/1935 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1937 | 01/12/1937 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1939 | 06/12/1939 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1940 | 15/01/1941 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1941 | 08/02/1942 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1943 | 06/07/1943 | 76 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1944 | 05/04/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1944 | 21/12/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9464 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1949 | 28/01/1949 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63481 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 463 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22061 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
04/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1921. Dep: 20/08/1921. | ||
22/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 15/10/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 463N |
||
04/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1926. Dep: 18/03/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7514 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3463 |
||
29/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1928. Dep: 23/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7524 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1930. Dep: 22/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7525 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7239 (Diagram 2) |
||
05/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7716 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1935. Dep: 04/10/1935. | ||
04/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1937. Dep: 01/12/1937. | ||
06/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. | ||
06/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1939. Dep: 06/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7505 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 15/01/1941. | ||
17/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1941. Dep: 08/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
22/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1943. Dep: 06/07/1943. | ||
18/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1944. Dep: 05/04/1944. | ||
21/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1944. Dep: 21/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9464 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3481 | ||
08/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
09/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/07/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 28/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8458 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63481 |
||
04/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
02/04/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63481 from Doncaster (36A) |