|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1922 | 19/08/1922 | 146 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1924 | 18/10/1924 | 116 days | General | Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3470 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1926 | 20/11/1926 | 129 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1927 | 05/04/1927 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1928 | 21/02/1929 | 75 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1931 | 25/11/1931 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1933 | 24/02/1934 | 108 days | General | Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1935 | 04/01/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1937 | 18/01/1938 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1940 | 08/05/1940 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1942 | 30/07/1942 | 21 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1945 | 23/02/1945 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 84 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1948 | 03/08/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63488 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1950 | 13/07/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1952 | 13/02/1952 | 1 day | No repairs | For general repair & also conversion to oil burning but partially dismantled prior to temporary use |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/02/0451 | Modification | Diagram 2 number 9467 boiler fitted | ||
06/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 470 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22068 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
27/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1922. Dep: 19/08/1922. | ||
25/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7719 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3470 |
||
17/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926. | ||
03/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1927. Dep: 05/04/1927. | ||
09/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1928. Dep: 21/02/1929. | ||
24/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1931. Dep: 25/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2) |
||
09/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1933. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7717 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1935. Dep: 04/01/1936. | ||
29/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1937. Dep: 18/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4403 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1940. Dep: 08/05/1940. | ||
10/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1942. Dep: 30/07/1942. | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
11/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1945. Dep: 23/02/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
30/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. | ||
23/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3488 | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 03/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9466 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63488 |
||
10/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8184 (Diagram 2) |
||
03/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/02/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952. Work undertaken: For general repair & also conversion to oil burning but partially dismantled prior to temporary use |
||
22/02/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63488 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
28/02/1952 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |