|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/08/1917 | 17/09/1917 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1922 | 11/07/1922 | 116 days | General | Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1924 | 29/08/1924 | 84 days | General | Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6201 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1927 | 24/08/1927 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1929 | 11/06/1929 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1931 | 06/10/1931 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1934 | 10/11/1934 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1939 | 13/01/1940 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1943 | 24/04/1943 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1947 | 07/08/1947 | 179 days | General | Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3727 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 63727 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1952 | 07/11/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22886 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1960 | 14/04/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1201 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4909 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/11/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/08/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1917. Dep: 17/09/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1462 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1922. Dep: 11/07/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1924. Dep: 29/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6201 |
||
04/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1927. Dep: 24/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 11/06/1929. | ||
05/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1931. Dep: 06/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
01/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3209 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3548 | ||
10/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1947. Dep: 07/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3393 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1947) number 3727 |
||
29/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63727 |
||
26/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
04/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
02/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 801 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952. | ||
27/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22886 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
08/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63727 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |