|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/12/1916 | 24/03/1917 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1921 | 08/10/1921 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1923 | 04/08/1923 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1925 | 15/08/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6210 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1928 | 21/07/1928 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1930 | 01/11/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1939 | 08/04/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1942 | 25/04/1942 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1948 | 04/09/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63762 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1950 | 23/09/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1951 | 26/01/1952 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1958 | 02/08/1958 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1962 | Gorton Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1210 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19866 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/12/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1916. Dep: 24/03/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/08/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
19/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1923. Dep: 04/08/1923. | ||
30/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6210 |
||
23/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 21/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. | ||
27/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3428 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3557 | ||
02/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3762 | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
28/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63762 |
||
19/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
10/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22105 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
29/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1951. Dep: 26/01/1952. | ||
21/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22102 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63762 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |