|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beyer Peacock Ltd. | 22/01/1920 | 20/07/1920 | 181 days | General | Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1922 | 06/01/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1925 | 15/08/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6225 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1927 | 03/12/1927 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1929 | 28/12/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1932 | 14/05/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1934 | 29/09/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1143 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1940 | 20/01/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3369 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1225 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19881 Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/01/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Beyer Peacock Ltd. (General) - Arr: 22/01/1920. Dep: 20/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1922. Dep: 06/01/1923. | ||
06/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6225 |
||
05/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929. | ||
07/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1143 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
21/03/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1250 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
13/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3369 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6225 from Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
10/10/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 732 |