|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/05/1920 | 03/07/1920 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1922 | 17/02/1923 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1925 | 26/09/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6226 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1928 | 18/02/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1930 | 15/02/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1932 | 02/07/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1143 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1934 | 01/09/1934 | 15 days | General | Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1938 | 13/08/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 8 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1947 | 08/11/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1950 | 04/02/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63573 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22293 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1955 | 09/04/1955 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1961 | 22/04/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1226 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19882 Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
29/05/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1922. Dep: 17/02/1923. | ||
27/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6226 |
||
14/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 18/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1389 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1143 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934. Work undertaken: Wakefield 2C Lubricator fitted Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/02/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
16/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3221 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3573 | ||
11/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
26/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63573 |
||
17/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
23/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22293 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1955. Dep: 09/04/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28288 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28944 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961. | ||
27/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63573 from Gorton (9G) |