|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/06/1927 | 03/09/1927 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6564 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1929 | 26/10/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1935 | 14/12/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1938 | 26/02/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1950 | 15/04/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63737 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1954 | 19/01/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1955 | 04/07/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1958 | 20/08/1958 | 5 days | General | Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1958 | 16/10/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1959 | 10/10/1959 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1807 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21774 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2922 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
04/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1927. Dep: 03/09/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6564 |
||
02/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/09/1927 | To Stock | To LNWR stock | ||
21/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929. | ||
06/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 26/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3737 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
15/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1950. Dep: 15/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63737 |
||
02/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1952. Dep: 23/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. | ||
10/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1954. Dep: 19/01/1954. | ||
14/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/07/1955. Dep: 04/07/1955. | ||
16/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 16/10/1958. | ||
12/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1959. Dep: 10/10/1959. | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63737 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |