|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/01/1924 | 15/03/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6356 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1926 | 10/07/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1928 | 19/01/1929 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1931 | 18/04/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 14/03/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1938 | 30/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/11/1942 | 24/12/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1945 | 16/03/1946 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 04/1946 | Light Repair | Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A) Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1947 | 29/11/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1948 | 04/09/1948 | 1 day | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63670 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1949 | 22/01/1949 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1949 | 10/12/1949 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1952 | 21/06/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1954 | 29/05/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1955 | 04/06/1955 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1956 | 30/06/1956 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28973 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1651 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3695 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2903 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
12/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6356 |
||
19/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/01/1924 | To Stock | To LNWR stock | ||
02/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926. | ||
13/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/04/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
15/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
09/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 |
||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A) Drop Grate fitted |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3670 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1947. Dep: 29/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63670 |
||
22/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949. | ||
10/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949. | ||
13/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5032 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
31/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955. | ||
02/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1956. Dep: 30/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
09/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28973 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
14/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28853 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63670 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |