|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 05/01/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1355c |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1924 | 16/08/1924 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6355 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1927 | 17/12/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1930 | 08/02/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1939 | 08/04/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3364 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 22 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1652 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3696 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2904 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1355c |
||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
31/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6355 |
||
1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
05/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927. | ||
02/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3364 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. | ||
09/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 720 from March (MAR) | ||
09/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 720 |