|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 07/06/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6350 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1927 | 18/06/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1929 | 13/07/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1930 | 08/11/1930 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1937 | 09/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1943 | 13/03/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1944 | 27/01/1945 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 5006 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1949 | 14/04/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 5083 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63676 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1951 | 12/05/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1959 | 08/12/1959 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1962 | 21/09/1962 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1657 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3701 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2907 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6350 |
||
07/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927. | ||
25/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 08/11/1930. | ||
13/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
01/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
03/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
02/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
18/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 27/01/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
04/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
01/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5006 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3676 | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
18/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1949. Dep: 14/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5083 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63676 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
12/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
03/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. | ||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/11/1959. Dep: 08/12/1959. | ||
08/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1962. Dep: 21/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63676 from Annesley (16D) |