|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 17/05/1924 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6332 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1926 | 31/07/1926 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1928 | 29/09/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1930 | 11/10/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1932 | 31/12/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1939 | 11/02/1939 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1941 | 27/09/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3443 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 755 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1659 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3703 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2909 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6332 |
||
14/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1926. Dep: 31/07/1926. | ||
11/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928. | ||
28/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1491 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 31/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/07/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939. | ||
13/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3443 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 755 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 755 from Doncaster (DON) |