|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/01/1924 | 16/02/1924 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6345 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1926 | 19/06/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1928 | 27/10/1928 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1930 | 18/10/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1932 | 12/11/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1937 | 27/04/1937 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1939 | 26/08/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 6 days | General | Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1666 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3710 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2911 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
05/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6345 |
||
16/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
13/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926. | ||
04/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 27/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930. | ||
05/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 859 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 27/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 731 from Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 731 |