|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1924 | 15/03/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6357 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1924 | 21/08/1924 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1928 | 07/06/1928 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 1521 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1930 | 27/06/1930 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1932 | 13/01/1933 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1934 | 02/02/1935 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1937 | 12/06/1937 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1939 | 03/11/1939 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1941 | 17/01/1942 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1944 | 29/01/1944 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1947 | 06/10/1947 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1949 | 28/01/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63665 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1950 | 16/02/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1952 | 09/08/1952 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1954 | 05/10/1954 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1954 | 08/10/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1956 | 29/09/1956 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1956 | 03/10/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1958 | 03/05/1958 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1958 | 15/05/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1960 | 01/10/1960 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1961 | 26/04/1961 | 15 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1627 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5213 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6357 |
||
15/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
20/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
24/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1924. Dep: 21/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
19/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1928. Dep: 07/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1521 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1930. Dep: 27/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 13/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1934. Dep: 02/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
19/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1939. Dep: 03/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3665 | ||
28/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1947. Dep: 06/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63665 |
||
15/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1950. Dep: 16/02/1950. | ||
19/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 05/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954. | ||
24/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
28/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 03/10/1956. | ||
23/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. | ||
17/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 15/05/1958. | ||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
06/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960. | ||
12/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1961. Dep: 26/04/1961. | ||
17/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63665 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |