|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 23/02/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1924 | 10/05/1924 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6361 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1925 | 24/10/1925 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1928 | 05/05/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1928 | 15/12/1928 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1931 | 21/02/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1246 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1933 | 21/10/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 03/09/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/04/1943 | 29/05/1943 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3668 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1949 | 02/07/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63668 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1951 | 01/12/1951 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 22232 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1955 | 04/06/1955 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22286 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1956 | 10/03/1956 | 22 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1631 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5217 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924. | ||
23/02/1924 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
25/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6361 |
||
16/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
24/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925. | ||
31/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 15/12/1928. | ||
07/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1246 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3668 |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
02/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
18/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63668 |
||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22232 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. | ||
14/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22286 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. | ||
02/12/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63668 from Mexborough (41F) |