|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/06/1925 | 19/09/1925 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6496 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1927 | 12/11/1927 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1930 | 29/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1932 | 10/12/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1935 | 02/05/1935 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1939 | 21/01/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/05/1943 | 12/06/1943 | 25 days | Heavy | Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 29/05/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63695 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1950 | 17/06/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1951 | 21/12/1951 | 2 days | Light Casual | Tender changed |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1952 | 20/12/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1954 | 25/09/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1677 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3721 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 19/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6496 |
||
19/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/09/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
25/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927. | ||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. | ||
03/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
02/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 02/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 21/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
22/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3695 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63695 |
||
04/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
03/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1950. Dep: 17/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
20/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 21/12/1951. Work undertaken: Tender changed |
||
29/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
04/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954. | ||
03/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63695 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |