|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/08/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6497 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1929 | 22/06/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1932 | 30/01/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1015 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1032 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1683 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3727 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6497 |
||
12/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/11/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
08/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 22/06/1929. | ||
16/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1015 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1032 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
18/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 706 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 706 |