|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 09/02/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6319 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1924 | 04/07/1924 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1927 | 05/09/1927 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1929 | 08/08/1929 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1931 | 14/08/1931 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1933 | 07/10/1933 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1935 | 30/11/1935 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1937 | 23/10/1937 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 35 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1946 | 28/12/1946 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63706 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1951 | 21/07/1951 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1954 | 03/02/1955 | 51 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1956 | 24/11/1956 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1960 | 06/04/1960 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1960 | 03/06/1960 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1962 | 27/07/1962 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1650 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3734 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6319 |
||
09/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
13/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1924. Dep: 04/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1927. Dep: 05/09/1927. | ||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 08/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 14/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1098 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3667 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. | ||
08/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3683 (Diagram 15D) |
||
24/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3706 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
07/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63706 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D) |
||
18/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
24/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
04/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
15/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 03/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D) |
||
17/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
15/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1956. Dep: 24/11/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. | ||
29/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/02/1960. Dep: 06/04/1960. | ||
24/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 03/06/1960. | ||
10/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1962. Dep: 27/07/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
26/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63706 from Langwith Junction (41J) |