|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/07/1925 | 24/10/1925 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6499 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1927 | 17/12/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1929 | 28/12/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1932 | 30/01/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1934 | 02/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1936 | 24/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1938 | 14/01/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1687 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3735 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
18/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6499 |
||
22/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/10/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
04/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
05/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927. | ||
07/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1330 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
24/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3356 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 712 from Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 712 |