|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 12/04/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6318 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1924 | 01/11/1924 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1927 | 04/06/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1929 | 31/08/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1931 | 21/03/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1933 | 22/07/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1936 | 25/01/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1937 | 13/02/1937 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1938 | 01/10/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/08/1942 | 04/09/1942 | 32 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/09/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 16 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1943 | 13/11/1943 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 22/05/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63708 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1950 | 30/09/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1950 | 16/10/1950 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1952 | 11/10/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1952 | 13/11/1952 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1955 | 07/05/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22335 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1957 | 13/07/1957 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1957 | 18/07/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1958 | 25/10/1958 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1688 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3736 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6318 |
||
12/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
15/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. | ||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
11/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 25/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937. | ||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1942. Dep: 04/09/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
11/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
09/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. | ||
12/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3708 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 22/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63708 |
||
27/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
11/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
09/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 16/10/1950. | ||
27/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22349 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 13/11/1952. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
09/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22335 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
22/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957. | ||
16/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/07/1957. Dep: 18/07/1957. | ||
04/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22314 (Diagram 15D) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63708 from Immingham (40B) |