|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 08/03/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6279 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1924 | 23/08/1924 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1927 | 16/07/1927 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1929 | 28/12/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1932 | 17/09/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1935 | 26/01/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1937 | 29/05/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1845 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21822 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6279 |
||
08/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
14/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
31/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
02/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
16/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
11/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927. | ||
16/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929. | ||
20/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 855 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 703 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 703 |