|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/03/1928 | 19/05/1928 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6580 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1930 | 14/11/1930 | 47 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1933 | 01/07/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1036 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1935 | 23/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1941 | 25/01/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3341 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1854 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21831 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2868 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
17/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6580 |
||
19/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
19/05/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
29/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1930. Dep: 14/11/1930. | ||
24/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1036 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/07/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
09/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
30/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
23/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
11/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3341 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 765 from Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 765 |