|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/01/1926 | 27/03/1926 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6514 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1928 | 24/11/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 18/03/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1935 | 04/05/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1941 | 05/07/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1867 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21844 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2935 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
02/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6514 |
||
27/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/03/1926 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
06/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
20/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928. | ||
01/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 938 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 725 from York (North) (YK) | ||
20/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 725 |