|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/01/1924 | 19/01/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1283c |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 24/05/1924 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6283 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1926 | 03/04/1926 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1928 | 22/12/1928 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1932 | 27/08/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1934 | 18/08/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1942 | 27/06/1942 | 32 days | General | Damaged by enemy action at York Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 95 days | General | Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1948 | 05/02/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63792 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1951 | 30/06/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1951 | 10/07/1951 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1952 | 30/08/1952 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1953 | 01/08/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1955 | 30/06/1955 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1957 | 31/08/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1959 | 06/05/1959 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1960 | 06/01/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1895 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21872 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 19/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1283c |
||
19/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
31/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6283 |
||
06/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926. | ||
15/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
||
25/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942. Work undertaken: Damaged by enemy action at York Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3792 | ||
14/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1948. Dep: 05/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63792 |
||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
06/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 10/07/1951. | ||
07/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952. | ||
25/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1953. Dep: 01/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 30/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959. | ||
22/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63792 from Annesley (16D) |