|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/06/1927 | 17/09/1927 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6595 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1931 | 28/11/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1933 | 22/07/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1935 | 30/11/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1941 | 10/05/1941 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1943 | 12/02/1944 | 108 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1948 | 18/12/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63795 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1950 | 18/02/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 1 day | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1954 | 18/12/1954 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1955 | 04/02/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1958 | 25/10/1958 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1899 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21876 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2941 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
11/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6595 |
||
20/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
20/09/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
18/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. | ||
20/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941. | ||
04/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
28/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1943. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3795 | ||
01/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. | ||
04/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63795 |
||
04/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1950. Dep: 18/02/1950. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
02/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
17/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. | ||
08/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1955. Dep: 04/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958. | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
29/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/07/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961. | ||
16/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. | ||
30/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63795 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |