|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 28/12/1923 | 7 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1306c |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1924 | 31/07/1924 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6306 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1926 | 27/08/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1928 | 21/06/1928 | 51 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1930 | 22/07/1930 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1932 | 20/08/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1934 | 05/07/1934 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1944 | 21/07/1944 | 40 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5019 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63827 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1951 | 01/12/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1951 | 10/12/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1954 | 08/07/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28852 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1957 | 31/08/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1961 | 04/08/1961 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1956 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22014 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2945 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 28/12/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1306c |
||
28/12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/12/1923 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
16/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 31/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6306 |
||
21/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1926. Dep: 27/08/1926. | ||
02/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1928. Dep: 21/06/1928. | ||
31/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 22/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 05/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
04/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
02/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1944. Dep: 21/07/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5019 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3827 | ||
29/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5106 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63827 |
||
17/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
25/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1951. Dep: 10/12/1951. | ||
13/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1954. Dep: 08/07/1954. | ||
06/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28852 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957. | ||
03/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1961. Dep: 04/08/1961. | ||
12/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63827 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |