|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/05/1928 | 18/08/1928 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6624 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1931 | 23/05/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1936 | 22/02/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1938 | 06/08/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/09/1942 | 28/11/1942 | 82 days | General | Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1944 | 15/04/1944 | 3 days | Light Repair | Tender repairs only |
||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 64 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3867 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1948 | 02/10/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63867 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1954 | 20/11/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1959 | 15/01/1960 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1961 | 09/12/1961 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1961 | 28/12/1961 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1962 | 28/06/1962 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2079 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22170 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 18/08/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6624 |
||
16/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/08/1928 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 23/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
30/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944. Work undertaken: Tender repairs only |
||
01/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
02/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3867 |
||
20/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63867 |
||
31/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. | ||
18/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1959. Dep: 15/01/1960. | ||
10/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/11/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961. | ||
28/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1961. Dep: 28/12/1961. | ||
23/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 28/06/1962. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63867 from Annesley (16D) |