|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/03/1927 | 18/06/1927 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6626 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1932 | 25/06/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1939 | 28/01/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 67 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1946 | 08/02/1947 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1947 | 20/06/1947 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1948 | 08/06/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63869 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1951 | 05/01/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1953 | 19/02/1953 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1955 | 03/03/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 40 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1956 | 16/03/1956 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1958 | 20/12/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2082 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22173 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6626 |
||
16/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
16/06/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
24/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
19/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
16/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
11/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
14/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3869 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1947. Dep: 20/06/1947. | ||
29/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 08/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63869 |
||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
29/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1951. Dep: 05/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1953. Dep: 19/02/1953. | ||
29/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1955. Dep: 03/03/1955. | ||
28/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/06/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 16/03/1956. | ||
12/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958. | ||
19/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63869 from Annesley (16D) |