Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 200 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18003 Week
» 71019 Month
» 190546 Year
» 3217399 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1231 |
m/e |
11/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8231 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5581 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65581 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T67 |
To Service |
During 11/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/04/1962 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
5w/e |
10/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/06/1959 |
Midland and Great Northern Joint line |
Between Sutton Bridge and South Lynn signalling has been removed throughout and track also, as far as Clenchwarton; from East Rudham eastwards, track and signalling have been removed as far as Fakenham; from Yarmouth Beach westwards, signalling has been removed as far as Hemsby and track as far as Newtown Halt-on 2nd August the breakdown train was in Great Ormesby station; the locomotive to work the dismantling train comes daily from Cromer Beach-often J17 65581, formerly of Yarmouth Beach shed which has now been completely dismantled. |
SLS/195909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1231 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8231 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5581 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65581 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
25/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65581 |
|
|