|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1934 | 27/08/1934 | 4 days | Light Repair | Tablet apparatus fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1934 | 17/09/1934 | 8 days | Light Repair | New L H Piston |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1934 | 24/11/1934 | 24 days | Light Repair | Prepared for visit to Vitry |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1935 | 30/03/1935 | 36 days | Light Repair | New oil cooling arrgangement fitted to R.C. gears |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1935 | 31/05/1935 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/12/1935 | 20/12/1935 | 1 day | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1936 | 07/07/1936 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1938 | 03/06/1938 | 14 days | Light Repair | New middle con rod |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1938 | 15/09/1938 | 3 days | Light Repair | Boiler repairs |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1938 | 14/04/1938 | -168 days | General | Rebuilt & streamlined |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/03/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1939 | 13/01/1940 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/12/1940 | 20/12/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1941 | 05/04/1941 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1942 | 25/04/1942 | 50 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 1 day | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1944 | 25/04/1944 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1944 | 14/09/1944 | 83 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A2/2 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/09/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | Green painting for exhibition in Edinburgh |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/11/1946 | 04/07/1947 | 235 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/01/1948 | 30/01/1948 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1950 | 21/02/1950 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1951 | 16/02/1951 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1951 | 21/03/1951 | 3 days | Special | Special exam after Balby bridge accident |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29837 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1953 | 02/04/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1953 | 17/07/1953 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1954 | 25/02/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1954 | 19/03/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1954 | 07/04/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1954 | 20/05/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1954 | 28/09/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1954 | 10/12/1954 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1956 | 28/09/1956 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29876 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1957 | 19/12/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1958 | 22/03/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1958 | 12/06/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1958 | 23/10/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1959 | 12/02/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1960 | 22/01/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
18/04/1953 | Scottish Miscellany | The 7.0 p.m. Edinburgh (Waverley) to Glasgow (Queen Street) Sundays only train has this year produced a number of York 50A locos. These include 60140 (three times), 60501 an 60515 (twice), 60502 an 60512. Also seen on this train 60095 (68E), 60965 (64A), 60823 (64A). This train is worked off St. Margarets depot, the engine returning on the Monday morning. No. 67500 a 4-4-2T has occasionally appeared on the Hyndland and Milngavie trains during recent weeks. New loco. No. 76000 was noted on (23/4) on local goods to Buchanan Street. B.R. 2-6-4T are now fairly regularly used on 5.51 p.m. Carlisle to Glasgow (St. Enoch). Water is taken at Dumfries and often at Kilmarnock. With 80008 some excellent work was experienced. A late start of 11 mins. at Carlisle was reduced to a late arrival at Dumfries of 5 mins. A late start from Dumfries of 8 minutes was converted to a 2 min. early arrival at Kilmarnock. Up the Nith Valley 50 m.p.h. was regularly got with eight coaches. From Kilmarnock to a stop at Gorbals Jct. the time was 30 mins. 46 secs. including a 15 m.p.h. crawl from Strathbungo. Between Shilford and Neilson 77 m.p.h. was reached. The crew appeared to have no trouble with the train at any time, in fact one would suggest their only trouble was to hold the engine in check, so freely did it run. 40185 (2-6-2T) has been working the Kirkcudbright branch recently. On occasion of Cup Final in Glasgow on (23/4) the bulk of the trains from Aberdeen were worked by L.M. Class 5, 4-6-0, assisted by 61400 of Kittybrewster depot and 60531 Bahram. |
SLS/195306 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/05/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2001, name: COCK O' THE NORTH Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1789 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 106 boiler fitted |
||
31/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
24/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1934. Dep: 27/08/1934. Work undertaken: Tablet apparatus fitted |
||
10/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1934. Dep: 17/09/1934. Work undertaken: New L H Piston |
||
01/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934. Work undertaken: Prepared for visit to Vitry |
||
21/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
23/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935. Work undertaken: New oil cooling arrgangement fitted to R.C. gears |
||
24/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1935. Dep: 31/05/1935. | ||
20/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/12/1935. Dep: 20/12/1935. | ||
27/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1936. Dep: 07/07/1936. | ||
15/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 03/06/1938. Work undertaken: New middle con rod |
||
13/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1938. Dep: 15/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler repairs |
||
30/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1938. Dep: 14/04/1938. Work undertaken: Rebuilt & streamlined |
||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. | ||
01/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. | ||
30/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940. | ||
13/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. | ||
13/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1940. Dep: 20/12/1940. | ||
04/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941. | ||
07/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942. | ||
16/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. | ||
25/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1944. Dep: 25/04/1944. | ||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 14/09/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A2/2 |
||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
22/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 990 but not taken up | ||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. | ||
25/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. Work undertaken: Green painting for exhibition in Edinburgh |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 501 | ||
12/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 04/07/1947. | ||
29/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1948. Dep: 30/01/1948. | ||
22/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60501 | ||
23/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. | ||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
27/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 21/02/1950. | ||
27/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
17/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
05/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/01/1951. Dep: 16/02/1951. | ||
19/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 21/03/1951. Work undertaken: Special exam after Balby bridge accident |
||
17/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29837 (Diagram 118) |
||
02/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/04/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953. | ||
12/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1953. Dep: 17/07/1953. | ||
29/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. | ||
18/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954. | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954. | ||
01/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1954. Dep: 07/04/1954. | ||
12/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1954. Dep: 20/05/1954. | ||
18/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1954. Dep: 28/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 10/12/1954. | ||
08/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29876 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 19/12/1957. | ||
14/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958. | ||
05/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1958. Dep: 12/06/1958. | ||
17/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
10/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1959. Dep: 12/02/1959. | ||
22/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/01/1960. Dep: 22/01/1960. | ||
08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60501 from York (North) (50A) |