|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1937 | 03/08/1937 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1937 | 19/11/1937 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1938 | 01/04/1938 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1939 | 03/07/1939 | 63 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1940 | 14/05/1940 | 30 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 47 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1941 | 13/00/1941 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1942 | 02/05/1942 | 46 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/01/1943 | 15/01/1943 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1943 | 04/06/1943 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1944 | 15/04/1944 | 79 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A2/2 Boiler number 8796 (Diagram 106A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/06/1944 | 21/06/1944 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/07/1944 | 16/08/1944 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/11/1944 | 28/11/1944 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1945 | 20/03/1945 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Inverurie Works | 17/04/1945 | 18/04/1945 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/05/1945 | 10/05/1945 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 25/06/1945 | 25/06/1945 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1945 | 12/09/1945 | 24 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/09/1945 | 25/09/1945 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 19/10/1945 | 19/10/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | After derailment at Craigentinny |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1946 | 17/01/1946 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/09/1946 | 18/09/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/01/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 289 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/12/1948 | 18/12/1948 | 5 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60506 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/05/1949 | 17/06/1949 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/07/1949 | 14/07/1949 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1950 | 28/07/1950 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1952 | 09/06/1952 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29867 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1952 | 29/10/1952 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1953 | 21/01/1953 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1953 | 09/12/1953 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1954 | 03/03/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1954 | 09/07/1954 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1955 | 14/02/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1956 | 07/02/1956 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1956 | 27/03/1956 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1956 | 19/07/1956 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1956 | 03/10/1956 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1956 | 05/01/1957 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1957 | 11/06/1957 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1957 | 22/10/1957 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1958 | 10/01/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1958 | 21/08/1958 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1958 | 02/10/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1958 | 21/11/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1959 | 27/02/1959 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 29840 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1959 | 25/09/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1961 | 04/04/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (On shed, waiting Works) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
29/01/1961 | New England | 60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. | SLS/196103 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/09/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2006, name: WOLF OF BADENOCH Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1842 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 108 boiler fitted |
||
16/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
27/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1937. Dep: 03/08/1937. | ||
07/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/10/1937. Dep: 19/11/1937. | ||
08/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1938. Dep: 01/04/1938. | ||
02/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1939. Dep: 03/07/1939. | ||
15/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/04/1940. Dep: 14/05/1940. | ||
29/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/10/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. | ||
23/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1941. Dep: 13/00/1941. | ||
18/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/03/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942. | ||
23/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
04/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1943. Dep: 15/01/1943. | ||
24/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1943. Dep: 04/06/1943. | ||
28/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/01/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A2/2 Boiler number 8796 (Diagram 106A) |
||
19/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1944. Dep: 21/06/1944. | ||
15/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/07/1944. Dep: 16/08/1944. | ||
17/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
27/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1944. Dep: 28/11/1944. | ||
11/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/03/1945. Dep: 20/03/1945. | ||
17/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1945. Dep: 18/04/1945. | ||
10/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1945. Dep: 10/05/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1945. Dep: 25/06/1945. | ||
20/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/08/1945. Dep: 12/09/1945. | ||
25/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1945. Dep: 25/09/1945. | ||
19/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/10/1945. Dep: 19/10/1945. Work undertaken: After derailment at Craigentinny |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 995 but not taken up | ||
08/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1946. Dep: 17/01/1946. | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 506 | ||
04/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1946. Dep: 18/09/1946. | ||
03/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. | ||
14/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60506 |
||
08/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
19/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/05/1949. Dep: 17/06/1949. | ||
14/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1949. Dep: 14/07/1949. | ||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1950. Dep: 28/07/1950. | ||
29/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1952. Dep: 09/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29867 (Diagram 118) |
||
30/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1952. Dep: 29/10/1952. | ||
02/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1953. Dep: 21/01/1953. | ||
11/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1953. Dep: 09/12/1953. | ||
25/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1954. Dep: 03/03/1954. | ||
26/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1954. Dep: 09/07/1954. | ||
17/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1955. Dep: 14/02/1955. | ||
03/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. | ||
18/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1956. Dep: 07/02/1956. | ||
24/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 27/03/1956. | ||
04/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1956. Dep: 19/07/1956. | ||
10/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1956. Dep: 03/10/1956. | ||
13/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1957. Dep: 11/06/1957. | ||
23/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 22/10/1957. | ||
02/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1958. Dep: 10/01/1958. | ||
06/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. | ||
07/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1958. Dep: 21/08/1958. | ||
22/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 02/10/1958. | ||
15/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1958. Dep: 21/11/1958. | ||
05/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1959. Dep: 27/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29840 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1959. Dep: 25/09/1959. | ||
04/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60506 from New England (34E) | ||
04/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/04/1961. Dep: 04/04/1961. |