|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1908 | 11/01/1908 | General | Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1911 | 21/01/1911 | General | Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1914 | 07/02/1914 | General | Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1919 | 24/05/1919 | General | Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1921 | 08/10/1921 | 106 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1923 | 05/04/1924 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5085 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1926 | 30/10/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1928 | 03/11/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1929 | 26/10/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1932 | 14/05/1932 | 36 days | General | Secondhand R.H. cylinder Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1937 | 25/09/1937 | 29 days | General | New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1942 | 23/05/1942 | 13 days | General | After collision Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1944 | 15/08/1944 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 85 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4212 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 11/01/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 21/01/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 07/02/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
05/05/1916 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 24/05/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
25/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921. | ||
10/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
24/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5085 |
||
21/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926. | ||
22/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
05/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
29/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932. Work undertaken: Secondhand R.H. cylinder Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
18/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
23/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
28/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
13/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942. Work undertaken: After collision Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 15/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3210 | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
10/10/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3210 from Ardsley (ARD) |