|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1911 | 11/03/1911 | General | Boiler number 859 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1917 | 03/02/1917 | General | Returned to UK 5/6/19 |
|||
Gorton Works | 12/07/1919 | 09/08/1919 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1921 | 01/10/1921 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1924 | 22/03/1924 | -155 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1925 | 13/02/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1928 | 28/04/1928 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1930 | 17/05/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1932 | 05/03/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1934 | 18/08/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1936 | 14/11/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1938 | 25/11/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1141 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4484 Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 11/03/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 859 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 03/02/1917. Work undertaken: Returned to UK 5/6/19 |
||
12/07/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1919. Dep: 09/08/1919. | ||
30/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1921. Dep: 01/10/1921. | ||
22/03/1924 | Modification | Diagram 17Sat number 431 boiler fitted | ||
22/03/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6141 | ||
25/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. | ||
21/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926. | ||
18/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. | ||
20/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
04/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1938. Dep: 25/11/1938. | ||
31/01/1939 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6141 from Langwith Junction (LNG) |