Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 2290   10/1920
LNER (1946) 3447   14/06/1946
BR 63447 w/e 11/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q610/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 38
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 10/1920 to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 29/04/1963 off Thornaby (51L)
Service Life 42 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 16/5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BOR Borough Gardens (New) 10/1920
DON Doncaster 27/12/1925
BOR Borough Gardens 28/03/1928
SEL Selby 28/03/1943
NPT Newport (Teeside) 06/02/1949
51L Thornaby 01/06/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 29/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 08/06/1958
WDN   29/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1920 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/38)
04/06/1928 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/32)
26/01/1931 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/21)
23/02/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2570)
17/05/1940 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3141)
08/07/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2818)
19/04/1947 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2639)
12/12/1949 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 4030)
16/09/1953 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24229)
15/05/1959 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24280)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 15/02/1924 10/04/1924 56 days General  
Darlington Works 28/03/1928 04/06/1928 69 days General
Boiler number E4/32 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 16/12/1930 26/01/1931 42 days General
Boiler number E4/21 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 26/01/1934 23/02/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1937 08/06/1937 41 days General  
Darlington Works 22/04/1940 17/05/1940 26 days General
Boiler number 3141 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 23/06/1941 15/07/1941 23 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/04/1942 03/06/1942 35 days General  
Darlington Works 14/06/1944 08/07/1944 25 days General
Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 21/02/1947 19/04/1947 58 days General
Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1948 09/12/1948 28 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63447
 
Darlington Works 17/11/1949 12/12/1949 26 days General
Boiler number 4030 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 30/01/1951 23/02/1951 25 days Light Intermediate
After derailment
 
Gateshead Works 14/02/1952 14/03/1952 30 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 28/04/1952 28/04/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 25/08/1953 16/09/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 17/05/1954 26/06/1954 41 days Heavy Casual
After derailment
 
Gateshead Works 29/06/1954 02/07/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 06/01/1955 09/02/1955 35 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 06/04/1956 22/05/1956 47 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 28/05/1956 31/05/1956 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/04/1959 15/05/1959 32 days General
Boiler number 24280 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 12/10/1959 17/10/1959 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/08/1961 31/08/1961 22 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as NER Number 2290
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 38
Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
15/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1924. Dep: 10/04/1924.    
27/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
28/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1928. Dep: 04/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E4/32 (Diagram 50)
   
16/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1930. Dep: 26/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E4/21 (Diagram 50)
   
26/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1934. Dep: 23/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50)
   
29/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1937. Dep: 08/06/1937.    
22/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1940. Dep: 17/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3141 (Diagram 50A)
   
23/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1941. Dep: 15/07/1941.    
30/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1942. Dep: 03/06/1942.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
14/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50)
   
14/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3447    
21/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50)
   
12/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1948. Dep: 09/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63447
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
17/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1949. Dep: 12/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4030 (Diagram 50A)
   
30/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
14/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952.    
28/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 28/04/1952.    
25/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1953. Dep: 16/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 50A)
   
17/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
29/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954.    
06/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1955. Dep: 09/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
06/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1956. Dep: 22/05/1956.    
28/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1956. Dep: 31/05/1956.    
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
14/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24280 (Diagram 50A)
   
12/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959.    
10/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1961. Dep: 31/08/1961.    
29/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63447 from Thornaby (51L)    

prev prev