|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/1911 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 1913 | 29/05/1913 | General | Boiler number 7194 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1923 | 02/06/1923 | 111 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1926 | 19/06/1926 | 103 days | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7833 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 403 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 968 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
01/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/01/1911. | ||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 29/05/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7194 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
12/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923. | ||
09/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7833 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3403 |
||
10/06/1929 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3403 from Ardsley (ARD) |