|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/1910 | General | Boiler number 1394 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 1911 | 28/09/1911 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1393 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1920 | 12/06/1920 | 94 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1923 | 31/01/1924 | 130 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 405N |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1927 | 31/12/1927 | 227 days | General | Boiler number 8050 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3405 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1929 | 15/06/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 36 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 405 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 965 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
03/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/03/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1394 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
07/03/1910 | Modification | Diagram 4Sat number 1538 boiler fitted | ||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 28/09/1911. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 1393 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
11/03/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1920. Dep: 12/06/1920. | ||
24/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1923. Dep: 31/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 405N |
||
19/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8050 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3405 |
||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929. | ||
19/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. | ||
26/06/1935 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3405 from Ardsley (ARD) |