|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/1910 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 04/1910 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 |
||||
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 23/07/1912 | General | Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7135 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 1919 | 01/11/1919 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1923 | 11/01/1924 | 110 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 407N |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1924 | 22/08/1924 | 52 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1928 | 02/11/1928 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 8088 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3407 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1931 | 18/07/1931 | 36 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 407 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 967 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
04/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910. | ||
04/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/04/1910. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 |
||
07/04/1910 | Modification | Diagram 4Sat number 1399 boiler fitted | ||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 23/07/1912. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class Q2 Boiler number 7135 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919. | ||
24/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1923. Dep: 11/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 407N |
||
02/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1924. Dep: 22/08/1924. | ||
29/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 02/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8088 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3407 |
||
13/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. | ||
16/06/1934 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3407 from Ardsley (ARD) |