Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1515 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19318 Week
» 72334 Month
» 191861 Year
» 3218714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
429 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3429 |
|
31/07/1925 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1903 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 1544) |
1909 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1541) |
05/03/1914 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7201) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
|
07/1909 |
|
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
1914 |
05/03/1914 |
|
General |
Boiler number 7201 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
24/02/1922 |
24/06/1922 |
121 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
12/01/1925 |
31/07/1925 |
201 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3429
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
29/08/1928 |
11/10/1928 |
44 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 429 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1013 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1909 |
Modification |
Diagram 4Sat number 1541 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/07/1909. |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 05/03/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7201 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
|
24/02/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922. |
|
|
12/01/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1925. Dep: 31/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3429
|
|
|
29/08/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1928. Dep: 11/10/1928. |
|
|
11/10/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
06/12/1930 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3429 from Hitchin (GNR) (HITL) |
|
|