Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 518 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18321 Week
» 71337 Month
» 190864 Year
» 3217717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
436 |
m/e |
03/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3436 |
|
25/04/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
233 |
Works Number |
1051 |
To Service |
During 03/1904 to Colwick (CLK) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/02/1930 off Colwick (CLK) |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1904 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1548) |
29/01/1920 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1396) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
1920 |
29/01/1920 |
|
General |
Boiler number 1396 (Diagram 4Sat)
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
16/06/1922 |
28/10/1922 |
135 days |
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
15/01/1925 |
25/04/1925 |
101 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3436
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
17/11/1927 |
02/02/1928 |
78 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 436 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1051 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 29/01/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1396 (Diagram 4Sat)
|
|
|
16/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1922. Dep: 28/10/1922. |
|
|
15/01/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3436
|
|
|
17/11/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1927. Dep: 02/02/1928. |
|
|
08/02/1930 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3436 from Colwick (CLK) |
|
|