|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1947 | 17/03/1947 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1947 | 29/09/1947 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1949 | 09/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 8933 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60935 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1951 | 25/01/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29390 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1954 | 13/04/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1958 | 11/07/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1958 | 07/08/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1958 | 20/08/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1959 | 08/05/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1961 | 02/09/1961 | 66 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1961 | 01/11/1961 | 23 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/02/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3662 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1894 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. | ||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. | ||
06/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 835 but not taken up | ||
24/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 935 | ||
03/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 17/03/1947. | ||
26/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1947. Dep: 29/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 09/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8933 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60935 |
||
18/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1951. Dep: 25/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29390 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1954. Dep: 13/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1958. Dep: 11/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1958. Dep: 07/08/1958. | ||
13/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958. | ||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 08/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
29/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/06/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
10/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1961. Dep: 01/11/1961. | ||
07/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60935 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |