|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 01/01/1924 | 18/02/1924 | 49 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7210 |
||
Stratford Works | 10/02/1926 | 03/05/1926 | 83 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 04/11/1929 | 05/12/1929 | 32 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 1932 | 18/08/1932 | General | ||||
Stratford Works | 09/04/1935 | 10/05/1935 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 231 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 1939 | 14/08/1939 | General | ||||
Stratford Works | 1944 | 08/01/1944 | General | Boiler number 234 (Diagram 40) |
|||
Stratford Works | 23/02/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 14/09/1946 | 11/10/1946 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/03/1947 | 18/04/1947 | 49 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 05/11/1947 | 08/11/1947 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 23/01/1948 | 06/02/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 21/09/1948 | 01/10/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 68129 |
||
Stratford Works | 29/11/1948 | 10/12/1948 | 12 days | Unknown Regime | |||
Stratford Works | 18/05/1949 | 24/06/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/04/1950 | 05/04/1950 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 1952 | 27/09/1952 | Unknown Regime | Renumbered to BR (Dept) number 33 |
|||
Stratford Works | 16/06/1952 | 26/07/1952 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 23972 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 1956 | 24/08/1956 | General | Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 40) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1951 | Unreported E.R. renumberings | locomotives In 6xxxx Series Renumbering. As it appeared that the weekly advices were occasionally incomplete, enquiries were made of the Public Relations Officers concerned, who have supplied the following dates: 1948: 60018 (16/10). 1949: 61747 8/1, 61652 5/4, 60523 14/5, 67444 24/9, 60522 29/9, 61663 19/11, 61910 (21/12). 1950: 60945 4/2, 68129 5/4, 67155 15/4, 61249 1/6, 61248 2/6, 65699 and 69095 28/10, 65530 18/11, 68730 (15/12). 1951: 67198 22/3, 68816 21/5, 63460 (29/6). Not yet renumbered: 67208, 68667, 68668, 68669 (68669 withdrawn from service 16/10/50). Note: In a few instances the records do not seem to be up-to-date, particularly in the case of service stock: e.g. 68667 was seen at Stratford 2/3/49, 68668 , and 68669 , so that these may have been renumbered somewhat earlier: also 67208 was seen there 19/11/49 and is said to have been done at least by mid-September. Other earlier recorded dates from observations are 60523 an 68129 by 8/1/49 and 67198 by 19/11/49. | SLS/195110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 210 Built at Stratford Works, Works Number 1628 Diagram 40 boiler fitted |
||
01/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1924. Dep: 18/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7210 |
||
10/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1926. Dep: 03/05/1926. | ||
04/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1929. Dep: 05/12/1929. | ||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: 18/08/1932. | ||
09/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1935. Dep: 10/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 231 (Diagram 40) |
||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 14/08/1939. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 234 (Diagram 40) |
||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. | ||
04/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8129 | ||
14/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 11/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) |
||
01/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 18/04/1947. | ||
05/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947. | ||
23/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1948. Dep: 06/02/1948. | ||
21/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 68129 |
||
29/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 29/11/1948. Dep: 10/12/1948. | ||
18/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1949. Dep: 24/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
03/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950. | ||
1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (Dept) number 33 |
||
16/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 23972 (Diagram 40) |
||
1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/1956. Dep: 24/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 40) |
||
12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 33 |