Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6113 m/e 08/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 61xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 08/1931
Withdrawal Thu 18/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 34 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81F Oxford 4w/e 24/01/1953
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/10/1957
81E Didcot 4w/e 13/08/1960
83B Taunton 4w/e 12/08/1961
88B Radyr 4w/e 30/11/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 6w/e 12/10/1964
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 08/11/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road w/e 29/11/1964
   Withdrawn 18/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 05/10/1964
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 2w/e 28/11/1964
WDN   18/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 6113
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
18/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6113    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev