Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6126 m/e 10/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 61xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1931
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 34 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 27/12/1952
81B Slough 8w/e 20/04/1957
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 31/12/1960
81E Didcot 4w/e 19/05/1962
81F Oxford 3w/e 04/05/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 81F Oxford 3w/e 04/05/1964
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 6126
Built at Swindon Works
   
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6126    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev